TN SB0932 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that government records unlawfully removed from a government records office be returned to their office of origin within two business days of the time safeguards are established to prevent further recurrence of unlawful removal. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 10; Title 12, Chapter 6 and Title 39, Chapter 16.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 10; Title 12, Chapter 6 and Title 39, Chapter 16, relative to governmental records.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1057 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee