TN SB0929 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes the selling of a consumer item with a radio frequency identification tag (RFID) a violation of the Consumer Protection Act unless such RFID is removed upon purchase of the item. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Title
As introduced, makes the selling of a consumer item with a radio frequency identification tag (RFID) a violation of the Consumer Protection Act unless such RFID is removed upon purchase of the item. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18.
Sponsors
Sen. Ophelia Ford [D] | Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C&L Comm. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1176 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Action Def. in s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee to 2014
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0929&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0929.pdf |