TN SB0925 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Failed in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Comm
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts drivers and passengers over 21 years of age from the requirement to wear a crash helmet while operating or riding in motorcycles, motor-driven cycles, and motorized bicycles, if the person is covered by health or medical insurance other than insurance through TennCare; makes a violation of the helmet law a secondary offense. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-302.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts drivers and passengers over 21 years of age from the requirement to wear a crash helmet while operating or riding in motorcycles, motor-driven cycles, and motorized bicycles, if the person is covered by health or medical insurance other than insurance through TennCare; makes a violation of the helmet law a secondary offense. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-302.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22SenateFailed in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Comm
2016-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
2016-03-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/22/2016
2016-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2016
2015-04-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/16/2015
2015-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015
2015-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/15/2015
2015-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee2 calendar for 4/14/2015
2015-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/14/2015
2015-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2015
2015-04-08SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2015-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/8/2015
2015-04-08SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Trans & Safety Comm. on 4/8/15
2015-03-25SenateFailed in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2015-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/25/2015
2015-03-18SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/25/2015
2015-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/18/2015
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0700 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-22 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback