TN SB0924 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 77
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, grants immunity from prosecution for possession of drug paraphernalia in certain situations when the person being searched alerts the officer to the presence of a hypodermic needle or similar object. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, grants immunity from prosecution for possession of drug paraphernalia in certain situations when the person being searched alerts the officer to the presence of a hypodermic needle or similar object. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 77 | |
2015-04-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1 |
2015-03-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/16/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0959 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 77