TN SB0918 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 295
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends certain discretionary powers to the board of regents and the University of Tennessee when purchasing or acquiring software for use restricted solely to academic teaching or research. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends certain discretionary powers to the board of regents and the University of Tennessee when purchasing or acquiring software for use restricted solely to academic teaching or research. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 4, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-07 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | Pub. Ch. 295 | |
2009-06-02 | Effective date(s) 05/27/09 | |
2009-05-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-05-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-18 | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-04-13 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-04-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-09 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-07 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/09/2009 | |
2009-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0951 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 295