TN SB0917 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, phases out the excise taxes imposed on tobacco products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, phases out the excise taxes imposed on tobacco products. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2013 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0888 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0917&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0917.pdf |