TN SB0913 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 874
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands the definition of "theater" for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to include certain movie theaters that have a beer permit and serve prepared food to patrons; removes requirement that wine and beer only be sold at a theater in an area accessible only to persons 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, expands the definition of "theater" for purposes of the sale of alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption to include certain movie theaters that have a beer permit and serve prepared food to patrons; removes requirement that wine and beer only be sold at a theater in an area accessible only to persons 21 years of age or older. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 874 | |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 1/20/2016 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 1/20/2016 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 1/12/2016 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reset to first calendar of 2016 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance,Ways & Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 2 PNV 0 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/7/2015 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1276 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 874