TN SB0911 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the index of appropriations from state tax revenues for 2021-2022 fiscal year to exceed the index of estimated growth in the state's economy by $431,600,000 or 2.37 percent. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 52.
Title
AN ACT pursuant to Article II, Section 24, of the Tennessee Constitution providing for the dollar amount and rate by which the growth of appropriations from state tax revenues will exceed the estimated growth in the state's economy and to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 52.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: APPROPRIATIONS CAL. PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective date(s) 05/17/2021 | |
2021-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 457 | |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/29/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1151 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 457