TN SB0911 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enhances the penalty for destruction or alteration of governmental records from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, enhances the penalty for destruction or alteration of governmental records from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 495 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 5/2/19 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Judiciary Committee 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0502 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 495