TN SB0907 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 109
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the department of safety to contract with a local government agency for the provision of any service related to the renewal of handgun carry permits; authorizes an agency contracting with the department to charge an additional fee of $4.00 for each renewal application. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the department of safety to contract with a local government agency for the provision of any service related to the renewal of handgun carry permits; authorizes an agency contracting with the department to charge an additional fee of $4.00 for each renewal application. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1351.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 109 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-03 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-07 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0731 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 109