TN SB0904 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes a county sheriff to create an inmate reentry education program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes a county sheriff to create an inmate reentry education program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49; Title 50; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 346
2019-04-24SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-16SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-03SenateRefer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-04-03SenateRecalled from Senate Education Committee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1324 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 346

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback