TN SB0900 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Pub. Ch. 829
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies, in regard to the authorization for the supreme court to commission former justices and judges as senior judges, that only former justices and judges who left their most recent term of judicial office in good standing with the board of judicial conduct will be eligible for a commission. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 16 and Title 17.
Title
As enacted, specifies, in regard to the authorization for the supreme court to commission former justices and judges as senior judges, that only former justices and judges who left their most recent term of judicial office in good standing with the board of judicial conduct will be eligible for a commission. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 16 and Title 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 829 | |
2018-05-04 | Effective date(s) 04/27/2018 | |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-19 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-04-17 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1173) |
2018-04-17 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-04-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0930) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1052 (Crossfiled) 2018-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 829