TN SB0899 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 293
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the authority for the department of environment and conservation to define "concentrated animal feeding operation" (CAFO) more stringently than federal law requires. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, removes the authority for the department of environment and conservation to define "concentrated animal feeding operation" (CAFO) more stringently than federal law requires. - Amends TCA Title 69, Chapter 3, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 293 | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1017 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 293