TN SB0898 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises bidding procedures for an LEA that does not follow the local governing body’s procedures to require 10 business days’ notice prior to the acceptance of bids for construction of, or additions to, buildings in excess of $10,000, instead of 10 days’ notice. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 49 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 49 and Title 66, relative to local education agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Education Committee (Y: 4 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0917 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration