TN SB0896 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the time within which an employer must document the basis of reasonable-suspicion drug or alcohol testing by an employer who runs a drug-free workplace from 24 hours to 30 hours. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Section 49-6-4213; Title 50; Section 63-1-126 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, increases the time within which an employer must document the basis of reasonable-suspicion drug or alcohol testing by an employer who runs a drug-free workplace from 24 hours to 30 hours. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Section 49-6-4213; Title 50; Section 63-1-126 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |