TN SB0894 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, clarifies that state law preempts local government enactments with respect to the regulation of and appropriate sanctions for conduct involving drugs and other similar substances. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 54 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, clarifies that state law preempts local government enactments with respect to the regulation of and appropriate sanctions for conduct involving drugs and other similar substances. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 40; Title 53, Chapter 11; Title 54 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 124
2017-03-27SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2017-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017
2017-03-23SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/27/2017
2017-03-21SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017
2017-03-07SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0173 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 124

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback