TN SB0893 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing restitution to victim; extends, from one year to two years, the time within which a victim of a crime may file a claim with the criminal injuries compensation fund. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 29 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 28; Title 29 and Title 40, relative to victim compensation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 413
2021-04-29SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/20/2021
2021-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2021
2021-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/14/2021
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/13/2021
2021-04-07SenateReset on Final calendar of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-04-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/6/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0870 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 413

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback