TN SB0893 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a process for requesting a reconsideration of cause of death determination on a death certificate; encourages county medical examiners who suspect that suicide is potential manner of death to consult the decedent's treating mental health professional. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7 and Title 68, Chapter 3.
Title
As enacted, creates a process for requesting a reconsideration of cause of death determination on a death certificate; encourages county medical examiners who suspect that suicide is potential manner of death to consult the decedent's treating mental health professional. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7 and Title 68, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 3 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493 | |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 3 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1149 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 493