TN SB0891 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires state agencies to produce an economic impact statement prior to entering a contract with a private party if either the contract is in excess of $2.5 million or the contract will result in the furlough or layoff of any state employees, instead of both; authorizes the chair of the appropriate standing committee to schedule a hearing to review the economic impact statement. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, requires state agencies to produce an economic impact statement prior to entering a contract with a private party if either the contract is in excess of $2.5 million or the contract will result in the furlough or layoff of any state employees, instead of both; authorizes the chair of the appropriate standing committee to schedule a hearing to review the economic impact statement. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1174 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-27 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.