TN SB0889 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates Oak Ridge Playhouse as an official state community theater. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, designates Oak Ridge Playhouse as an official state community theater. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 101 | |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/9/2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0985 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-19 - Pub. Ch. 101