TN SB0887 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a DUI monitoring indigency fund that is separate from the electronic monitoring indigency fund. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 69.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 69, relative to indigency funds.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0325 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback