TN SB0880 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that state and local taxes and fees be excluded from the calculation of interchange fees by payment card networks for electronic payment transactions. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxes and fees collected by merchants and sellers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/8/2022 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 3/2022 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0375 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.