TN SB0878 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 50 percent to 40 percent of the employee's income after deduction of FICA, withholding taxes, and a health insurance premium that covers the child the amount that may be withheld in an order of assignment of income for support. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-501.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 50 percent to 40 percent of the employee's income after deduction of FICA, withholding taxes, and a health insurance premium that covers the child the amount that may be withheld in an order of assignment of income for support. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-501.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0598 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-14 - Withdrawn.