TN SB0877 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Pub. Ch. 117
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to mechanics' and materialmen's liens. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 11.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions relative to mechanics' and materialmen's liens. - Amends TCA Title 66, Chapter 11.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Pub. Ch. 117 | |
2015-04-20 | Effective date(s) 04/10/2015 | |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/16/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1183 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 117