TN SB0875 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the process for restoration of voting rights, including consolidating the process for the issuance of a certificate of voting rights restoration through the secretary of state's office. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes to the process for restoration of voting rights, including consolidating the process for the issuance of a certificate of voting rights restoration through the secretary of state's office. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1258 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary