TN SB0874 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, exempts from the sales and use tax online access to continuing education courses that meet regulatory requirements for licensed individuals and that are offered by organizations that have received a determination of exemption from the IRS as a charitable organization or business association. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-04-21 | Pub. Ch. 139 | |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-03-29 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0100) |
2021-03-29 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 1 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0079) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 2 PNV 1 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation, as amended |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1191 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 139