TN SB0874 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 397
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes certain exemptions and defenses to offenses involving certain explosives and components to allow certain use in lawful sporting activity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 7; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 105.
Title
As enacted, establishes certain exemptions and defenses to offenses involving certain explosives and components to allow certain use in lawful sporting activity. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 7; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13; Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 1 and Title 68, Chapter 105.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 397 | |
2015-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/08/2015 | |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 30, Nays 1 (Amendment 1 - HA0332) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 7, PNV 2 |
2015-04-20 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0332) |
2015-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 3 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2015 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0934 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 397