TN SB0872 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits counties, including counties with a metropolitan form of government, and municipalities from regulating the operation of an online marketplace or requiring an online marketplace to provide personally identifiable information of users without an administrative subpoena or court order. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12; Title 13; Title 42; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56; Title 62; Title 65; Title 66; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to services offered through online marketplace providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 339 | |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1336 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021