TN SB0868 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires law enforcement officers to wear wide angle body cameras that record video footage while on duty, if funded by grants, private donations, or federal funds. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Title
As introduced, requires law enforcement officers to wear wide angle body cameras that record video footage while on duty, if funded by grants, private donations, or federal funds. - Amends TCA Title 38.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0712 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-25 - Def. to Summer Study
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0868&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0868.pdf |