TN SB0867 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires conservators other than public guardians to complete educational training on conservatorships within 30 days of appointment; allows a guardian ad litem to obtain a credit report and state and national criminal history background checks for a proposed fiduciary. - Amends TCA Title 34.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires conservators other than public guardians to complete educational training on conservatorships within 30 days of appointment; allows a guardian ad litem to obtain a credit report and state and national criminal history background checks for a proposed fiduciary. - Amends TCA Title 34.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0896 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Families Subcommittee of Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback