TN SB0865 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a handgun carry permit holder convicted of domestic assault to surrender the permit to the court within 48 hours of conviction to be forwarded to the department of safety for revocation. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires a handgun carry permit holder convicted of domestic assault to surrender the permit to the court within 48 hours of conviction to be forwarded to the department of safety for revocation. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateFailed in Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1447 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback