TN SB0860 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises provisions regarding the use of collection receptacles for solicitations, such as removing the requirement that written permission obtained from the owner or leaseholder of property be notarized, reducing the time period to remove a receptacle after receiving written notice from 30 days to seven days, and designating certain violations as constituting trespassing. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, revises provisions regarding the use of collection receptacles for solicitations, such as removing the requirement that written permission obtained from the owner or leaseholder of property be notarized, reducing the time period to remove a receptacle after receiving written notice from 30 days to seven days, and designating certain violations as constituting trespassing. - Amends TCA Title 48, Chapter 101, Part 5.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0442 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-27 - Sponsor(s) Added.