TN SB0859 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the general assembly to end a state of emergency that was declared because of a public health emergency by the passage of a joint resolution; requires the governor to provide certain information to the general assembly relative to a declared state of emergency based on a public health emergency. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 58, Chapter 2 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 58, Chapter 2 and Title 68, relative to public health emergencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0869 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration