TN SB0858 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the City of Erwin, by ordinance adopted by a two-thirds vote, to levy an occupancy tax of not more than 2.5 percent on the privilege of staying in any hotel or motel in Erwin; the ordinance must set forth the manner of collection and administration of the privilege tax; requires that all proceeds received by the municipality from the tax be used for tourism development. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the City of Erwin, by ordinance adopted by a two-thirds vote, to levy an occupancy tax of not more than 2.5 percent on the privilege of staying in any hotel or motel in Erwin; the ordinance must set forth the manner of collection and administration of the privilege tax; requires that all proceeds received by the municipality from the tax be used for tourism development. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-1425.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 241 | |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0073 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 241