TN SB0856 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department and the governing board of each public institution of higher education to promulgate rules to ensure compliance with Title VI of the Civil Rights Act of 1964 and Title IX of the Education Amendments of 1972; allows the comptroller to conduct a thorough review of the department's office for civil rights and the governing board of each public institution of higher education. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1 and Title 49, Chapter 7, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0576 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Failed in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Administration