TN SB0851 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends, from 10 days to 14 days, the period by which the prevailing wage commission is required to give notice of its determination after a hearing to determine the prevailing wage rate for state highway construction projects. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 12.
Title
As introduced, extends, from 10 days to 14 days, the period by which the prevailing wage commission is required to give notice of its determination after a hearing to determine the prevailing wage rate for state highway construction projects. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 12.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0618 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee