TN SB0850 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the governor or the chief executive officer of a local government from requiring a law enforcement agency or an officer thereof from enforcing executive orders that require private business entities to close, restrict the freedom to assemble peaceably, or restrict the freedom to travel. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 9, relative to civil emergencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0700 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal. in State Government Committee