TN SB0849 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2020
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, increases the age to access or use tobacco and vapor products from 18 to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, increases the age to access or use tobacco and vapor products from 18 to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2020
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to last calendar
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to last calendar
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1459 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback