TN SB0849 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the age to access or use tobacco and vapor products from 18 to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, increases the age to access or use tobacco and vapor products from 18 to 21 years of age. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/4/2020 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/14/2020 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2020 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to last calendar |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to last calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1459 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.