TN SB0849 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 261
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-25 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 261
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes $4.00 to be deducted from the wages of prisoners in a county workhouse in certain circumstances to satisfy judgments against the prisoner to make restitution to the victim. - Amends TCA Section 41-2-129(c).
Title
As enacted, authorizes $4.00 to be deducted from the wages of prisoners in a county workhouse in certain circumstances to satisfy judgments against the prisoner to make restitution to the victim. - Amends TCA Section 41-2-129(c).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-25 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 261 | |
2011-05-09 | Passed S., Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-09 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-02-17 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-16 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-15 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0974 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-25 - Pub. Ch. 261