TN SB0849 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes compensation program for qualified small in-state dealers to recoup portion of expenses derived from collecting and remitting tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Title
As introduced, establishes compensation program for qualified small in-state dealers to recoup portion of expenses derived from collecting and remitting tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0733 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0849&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0849.pdf |