TN SB0846 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, for purposes of a retired member of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system (TCRS), or a retiree of a local retirement fund, returning to work temporarily, authorizes the submission in an electronic format by the head of the employing entity, or the head's designee, certification to the retirement division of the member's name, period to be employed, number of days to be worked, compensation to be paid, and anticipated termination date, and a statement showing working hours and compensation for the retiree. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 36, Part 8, relative to retirement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2024
2023-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2023
2023-03-28SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/29/2023
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/21/2023
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0917 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback