TN SB0845 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 394
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing the repeal of or amendment to an ordinance increasing the number of county commissioners in cities that incorporate under general law with a city manager-commission charter. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing the repeal of or amendment to an ordinance increasing the number of county commissioners in cities that incorporate under general law with a city manager-commission charter. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 394 | |
2015-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0146) |
2015-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0403) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0304 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 394