TN SB0834 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a copy of revised county district maps to be filed with the librarian of the legislative reference and law library beginning April 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 16, Part 1; Title 5, Chapter 1 and Title 5, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, requires a copy of revised county district maps to be filed with the librarian of the legislative reference and law library beginning April 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 16, Part 1; Title 5, Chapter 1 and Title 5, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0840 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0834&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0834.pdf |