TN SB0831 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a manufacturer, under certain circumstances, to replace farm machinery with comparable farm machinery or accept return of the farm machinery and refund the full purchase price and related repair costs, less a reasonable allowance for use and a reasonable offset for physical damage; creates a civil cause of action for consumers. - Amends TCA Title 43; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 55.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 43; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 55, relative to consumer protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411 | |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0830 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021