TN SB0828 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires local law enforcement to conduct in-person checks to ensure person subject to order of protection has complied with dispossession of firearms requirement; makes various other changes regarding the dispossession of firearms requirement. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires local law enforcement to conduct in-person checks to ensure person subject to order of protection has complied with dispossession of firearms requirement; makes various other changes regarding the dispossession of firearms requirement. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 38; Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 1 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateWithdrawn.
2019-04-09SenateRecalled from Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0568 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Failed for lack of second in: Children & Families Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback