TN SB0828 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 426
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits any release eligibility for a person committing aggravated child neglect or endangerment, on or after July 1, 2013, until the person has served 70 percent of the sentence imposed by the court less sentence credits earned and retained. - Amends TCA Titles 39 and 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits any release eligibility for a person committing aggravated child neglect or endangerment, on or after July 1, 2013, until the person has served 70 percent of the sentence imposed by the court less sentence credits earned and retained. - Amends TCA Titles 39 and 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22SenatePub. Ch. 426
2013-05-22SenateEffective date(s) 07/01/2013
2013-05-16SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-05-06SenateTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-05-01SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-05-01SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-18SenatePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0
2013-04-18SenateAm. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0581)
2013-04-18SenateSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-04-18SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-04-18SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 0
2013-04-18SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0533)
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013
2013-04-17SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/17/2013
2013-04-17SenateR/S #83(8) to be heard in S. F,W&M Comm. 4/17/2013
2013-04-09SenateAssigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013
2013-04-08SenateAction Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/9/2013
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2013
2013-03-12SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm.
2013-03-06SenatePlaced on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013
2013-02-06SenateP2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2013-02-04SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-31SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1036 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 426

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback