TN SB0828 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows governor to employ additional counsel to the attorney general or in lieu of the attorney general if the governor determines it is in the interest of the state following consultation with the attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows governor to employ additional counsel to the attorney general or in lieu of the attorney general if the governor determines it is in the interest of the state following consultation with the attorney general. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 6, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-15 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-14 Re-ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2011-04-12 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2011
2011-04-11 S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2011
2011-04-08 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2011
2011-03-15 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2011-03-09 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/15/2011
2011-02-17 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2011-02-16 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-15 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1724 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback