TN SB0828 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Labor & Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, delays the sale of land to foreclose a loan, mortgage, or deed of trust for a period of time; requires first publication of notice be at least 90 days prior to sale instead of at least 20 days prior to sale. - Amends TCA Section 35-5-101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, delays the sale of land to foreclose a loan, mortgage, or deed of trust for a period of time; requires first publication of notice be at least 90 days prior to sale instead of at least 20 days prior to sale. - Amends TCA Section 35-5-101.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-18 P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm.
2009-02-12 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-11 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0099 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-07 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback