TN SB0822 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Hearing: Feb 26 @ 9:30 am in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, revises provisions governing voter registration applications through the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, revises provisions governing voter registration applications through the department of safety. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0553 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback